Financial history THE ONGAR CLUB FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 1031411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.37k £2.25k £2.00k £535 £1
Total expenditure £3.73k £2.00k £2.20k £142 £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A