Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE ARCHITECTURAL AND YORK ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY (YAYAS)

Charity number: 1031454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required