WHAPLODE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1032722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.26k £1.93k £2.25k £1.69k £483
Total expenditure £3.39k £2.01k £2.03k £1.39k £727
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A