Financial history CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU

Charity number: 1034245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £51.19m £50.24m £52.36m £72.37m £65.47m
Total expenditure £50.86m £48.50m £49.10m £68.36m £71.68m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.42m £33.72m £34.20m £53.58m £46.79m
Income - Donations and legacies £34.43m £33.74m £34.27m £54.14m £47.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £193.00k £186.00k £180.00k £23.00k £64.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £74.00k £119.00k £110.00k £15.00k £26.00k
Income - Other £16.49m £16.19m £17.80m £18.18m £18.22m
Income - Legacies £0 £8.00k £64.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.02m £36.01m £35.78m £55.65m £48.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £81.00k £75.00k £76.00k £66.00k £77.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £30.74m £29.16m £29.42m £50.33m £42.43m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £13.84m £12.49m £13.32m £12.70m £23.63m