ST MARY AND ST JOSEPH RC SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (POCKLINGTON)

Charity number: 1034619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required