ST MARY AND ST JOSEPH RC SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (POCKLINGTON)

Charity number: 1034619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.00k £4.14k £2.88k £1.42k £229
Total expenditure £3.89k £5.05k £3.67k £2.32k £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A