THE ANVIL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1034961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.00m £4.64m £4.75m £5.05m £5.32m
Total expenditure £4.82m £4.70m £4.86m £5.03m £5.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.31m £1.20m £1.13m £1.06m £984.97k
Income - Donations and legacies £91.85k £11.60k £1.14m £21.89k £1.01m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £813.84k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.89m £4.61m £2.79m £5.01m £4.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.49k £18.27k £14.79k £16.79k £16.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.30k £0
Income - Legacies £85.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.82m £4.70m £4.86m £5.03m £5.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.91k £12.76k £17.50k £0 £22.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0