Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF ST IVES TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1035329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £29.95k £29.41k £25.47k £14.36k £26.22k
Total expenditure £28.15k £26.11k £19.74k £12.88k £28.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A