Dogfen lywodraethu FACULTY OF OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
STANDING ORDERS ADOPTED 1ST MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 6 MAY 2004, 19 MAY 2005, 22 MAY 2008, 14 MAY 2009 AND 27 MAY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENIFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE IN THE FIELD OF OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE. 2. TO ACT AS AN AUTHORITATIVE BODY FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSULTATION IN MATTERS OF EDUCATIONAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST CONCERNING OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE. 3. TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN FOR THE PUBLIC BENIFIT THE GOOD PRACTICE OF OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE WITH A VIEW TO PROVIDING FOR THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AT WORK BY ENSURING THE HIGHEST PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS OF COMPETENCE AND ETHICAL INTEGRITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.