Financial history NEW WAYS

Charity number: 1035688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £513.30k £587.08k £275.24k £281.49k £429.79k
Total expenditure £529.98k £455.15k £430.55k £346.93k £360.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £454.16k £586.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £59.12k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £25 £94 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £510.56k £440.12k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.41k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.24k £4.30k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £495.71k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £15.03k N/A N/A N/A