SUSSEX HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 July 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 July 2019 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download