SUSSEX HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.79m £3.81m £3.99m £4.22m £4.14m
Total expenditure £3.80m £3.71m £3.75m £4.07m £3.76m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £214.66k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.47m £3.59m £3.80m £4.01m £3.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £191 £14 £1.59k £4.07k £3.57k
Income - Other £324.76k £225.54k £193.76k £199.59k £442.54k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.80m £3.71m £3.75m £4.07m £3.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.24k £7.91k £7.96k £8.37k £9.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0