FRIENDS OF HOCKWOLD SITE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036202
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Cooper Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Samantha Newman Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record
Victorianna Chalk Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Gail Fish Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Claire Barnes Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
EMMA OWNER Trustee 10 November 2011 None on record
Lisa Barrow Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Jessica Burdett Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record
Clare Kellett Trustee 11 October 2017 None on record
Gary Hockins Chair 09 October 2019 None on record
Victoria Reader Trustee 15 November 2021 None on record
HEATHER BAKER Trustee 04 November 1993 None on record