ASHLEY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1036309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.29k £13.34k £15.78k £10.01k £7.84k
Total expenditure £9.57k £7.89k £25.64k £9.24k £8.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A