Governing document THE FRIENDS OF SWAFFHAM JUNIOR ACADEMY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 2 MAY 1996, 11 OCTOBER 2005 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.