ACTION FOR ME

Charity number: 1036419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £681.69k £1.27m £1.11m £949.53k £1.19m
Total expenditure £741.13k £1.05m £1.28m £985.98k £832.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A N/A £63.70k £21.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £528.56k £1.01m £823.30k £828.68k £999.11k
Income - Other trading activities £19.34k £128.47k £161.31k £34.78k £111.32k
Income - Charitable activities £132.89k £131.18k £127.22k £84.81k £81.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £675 £296 £1.13k £1.27k £301
Income - Other £232 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £39.81k £241.55k £97.04k £131.00k £127.92k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £555.83k £811.36k £1.01m £844.99k £716.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £181.89k £230.86k £269.63k £140.99k £115.81k
Expenditure - Governance £53.95k £49.50k £36.04k £35.30k £30.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £51.48k £0 £51.09k £17.55k £15.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.42k £4.57k £0 £0 £0