Dogfen lywodraethu HOLY TRINITY CHURCH OF ENGLAND V A SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2015 as amended on 28 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL(NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY (LEA). FULFILMENT OF THIS OBJECTIVE THE ASSOCIATION MAY:- (A) FOSTER RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS, GOVERNORS AND PUPILS, (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT; (C) ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO SUPPORT THE WORKING OF THE SCHOOL (WHERE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.