THE CONGREGATION OF THE DAUGHTERS OF MARY MOTHER OF MERCY IN THE BRITISH ISLES

Charity number: 1036524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 December 2018 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 December 2018 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 January 2018 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 January 2018 69 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 January 2017 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 31 January 2017 92 days late Download