FRIENDS OF PARK ROAD SCHOOL(TIMPERLEY)

Charity number: 1036651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 January 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required