Accounts and annual returns CONISTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036917
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 March 2020 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 July 2019 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 July 2019 160 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late Download Open in new window