TUNBRIDGE WELLS ST MARKS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037130
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £10.96k £8.78k £14.59k £14.03k £13.93k
Total expenditure £7.13k £10.87k £12.89k £11.23k £4.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A