THE RAVC WELFARE & BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1037208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RSM Angela Speer Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
Lt Col Kay Hanson Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
Lt Col Caroline Whittle Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
Brigadier Roly Walker Chair 01 March 2017 None on record
LT COLONEL ABBY DUBAREE Trustee 31 July 2011 None on record
Lt Col Chris Ham Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Colonel Douglas Macdonald Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
RSM Jody Honeywood Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
Lt Col Martyn Thompson MBE Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
Colonel Neil Christopher Smith QHVS FRCVS Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record