BILLERICAY CATHOLIC PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1037616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £72.46k £79.15k £79.02k £89.66k £82.27k
Total expenditure £67.34k £73.66k £77.05k £80.42k £78.01k
Income from government contracts £45.67k £52.85k £49.54k N/A £60.80k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £61.01k N/A