Trustees BOWERHILL PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Charity number: 1038501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Jones | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn King | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Burville | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Peerman | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Bailey | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Holman | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Saunders | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hobday | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.