Financial history SWANSEA ART SOCIETY

Charity number: 1038647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.27k £1.59k £2.46k £3.20k £37.93k
Total expenditure £3.27k £3.16k £2.28k £275 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A