MANIFOLD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £12.94k £35.21k £29.13k £37.88k £27.53k
Total expenditure £13.42k £27.79k £24.04k £35.23k £27.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A