Trustees AFRICA 95
Charity number: 1039039
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLAH WAKATAMA ALLFREY OBE | Chair | 25 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Mbia Tunga Kalinda | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simiso Velempin | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olubukola Adejoke Akinyemi | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geetha Thamaratnam | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nii Ayikwei Parkes | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Neil Robertson Niven | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALICIA BARBARA ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.