CRANK NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1039121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £701.71k £788.51k £776.05k £786.98k £722.15k
Total expenditure £704.85k £749.90k £984.70k £822.45k £726.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £104.89k £191.24k £221.92k £187.89k £308.24k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £497 £0
Income - Charitable activities £596.47k £597.18k £546.83k £598.14k £413.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £346 £101 £402 £453 £92
Income - Other £0 £0 £6.90k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £704.85k £749.90k £984.70k £822.45k £726.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.08k £8.01k £10.74k £14.29k £16.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0