Financial history THE LONDON LECTURES TRUST

Charity number: 1039366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.28k £2.79k £2.89k £1.90k £2.47k
Total expenditure £5.30k £2.71k £3.41k £1.42k £1.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A