Accounts and annual returns ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1039386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window