Financial history ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1039386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.10m £9.31m £9.11m £9.94m £9.96m
Total expenditure £7.09m £9.29m £9.07m £9.88m £9.85m
Income from government contracts £5.34m £7.61m £7.66m £7.59m £7.85m
Income from government grants £54.30k £31.33k £19.89k £182.46k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £25.09k £56.88k £9.93k £23.76k £6.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.10m £9.26m £9.10m £9.92m £9.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment -£20.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £184.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.08m £9.27m £9.07m £9.88m £9.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.58k £20.59k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £102.82k £113.96k £121.34k £146.30k £170.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0