Trustees ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1039386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop John David Edward Davies Trustee 23 March 2022
HOUSING JUSTICE
Received: On time
Dr Andrea Lynne Davies Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Dafydd Rhys James Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Karen Jayne Ozzati Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Mary Sherwood Trustee 01 April 2021
BIKEABILITY WALES
Received: On time
Mair Elliot Trustee 01 April 2021
WELSH CENTRE FOR ACTION ON DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION LTD
Received: On time
EIN CYFLE CIO
Received: On time
Howard Jones Trustee 01 April 2021
EIN CYFLE CIO
Received: On time
HAFAL
Received: On time
Rev Sue Northcott Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
MAGGIE DIX Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Suzanne Duval Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Richard Owen Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Dean Pulling Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
CLIVE EDMUND WOLFENDALE Trustee 08 July 2020
RYDAL PENRHOS LIMITED
Received: On time
CYFEILLION CANOLFAN GERDD WILLIAM MATHIAS
Received: On time
HAFAL
Received: On time
Carys Lloyd Roberts Trustee 20 December 2016
None on record
Simon Paul Green Trustee 28 May 2014
WELSH CENTRE FOR ACTION ON DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION LTD
Received: On time
EIN CYFLE CIO
Received: On time
Dr DYFRIG MORGAN AP DAFYDD Trustee
None on record
ROBERT CLEDWYN WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record