CARING HANDS

Charity number: 1039527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time Download