Accounts and annual returns Friends of St Cuthbert Mayne School Torquay

Charity number: 1039645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2022 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2022 722 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 June 2022 1088 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required