Accounts and annual returns CARLISLE MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1039660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 April 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 April 2019 29 October 2020 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 April 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2017 01 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2017 Not Required