Financial history CARLISLE MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1039660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2017 18/04/2018 18/04/2019 18/04/2020 18/04/2021
Total gross income £7.12k £8.10k £8.57k £8.07k £388
Total expenditure £5.75k £5.75k £6.56k £5.53k £743
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A