Governing document LIVERPOOL LEARNING DIFFERENCE ATHLETICS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/1994 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/1995 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2000 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH IQ CLASSIFICATIONS 'MILD 50-70' MODERATE '35-49' OR THE CLASSIFICATIONS OF 'SPECIFIC LEARNING DISABILITY' AND RESIDENT WITHIN THE BOUNDARY OF MERSEYSIDE BY THE ASSISTANCE OR PROVISION OR FACILITIES FOR (I) PHYSICAL RECREATION (II) NON COMPETITIVE SPORT (III) COMPETITIVE SPORT.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.