Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE PORTSMOUTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN PORTSMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
PORTSMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.