Financial history LEICESTERSHIRE LIFE EDUCATION CENTRES TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1040007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £65.59k £60.05k £44.05k £23.90k £37.66k
Total expenditure £62.56k £64.81k £46.96k £31.67k £37.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £11.27k