Financial history Haven Tyneside Limited

Charity number: 1040208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £909.95k £930.61k £972.93k £1.08m £1.15m
Total expenditure £841.28k £882.77k £981.66k £1.01m £1.09m
Income from government contracts £187.49k £131.50k £131.50k N/A £131.50k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £131.50k £6.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.26k £5.90k £5.40k £3.49k £3.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £905.38k £924.22k £966.35k £1.07m £1.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £309 £0 £1.19k £1.71k £427
Income - Other £0 £491 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £4.26k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.93k £882.77k £981.66k £1.01m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £841.28k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.62k £25.79k £14.31k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0