RAMANA MAHARSHI FOUNDATION U.K.

Charity number: 1040280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.50k £3.42k £4.02k £5.32k £7.83k
Total expenditure £4.51k £5.10k £4.86k £5.95k £5.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A