Accounts and annual returns FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, EXETER

Charity number: 1040318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 28 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required