Financial history BORDER PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1040403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £83.69k £118.43k £102.59k £87.22k £87.61k
Total expenditure £70.57k £79.73k £86.45k £77.57k £83.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £148 N/A £360