THE SALFORD CHORAL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity number: 1040437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required