THE SWANNERY TRUST

Charity number: 1040740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £36.34k £57.39k £16.16k £23.70k £30.88k
Total expenditure £34.82k £29.56k £29.81k £31.10k £34.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £2.50k £1.70k £700 £1.70k