Trustees NOTTINGHAMSHIRE DEAF SOCIETY
Charity number: 1040801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM HASTINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Angelina Pullen | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hawkins | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Clarke | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Robinson | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirstin Susan Greenhill | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Peacock | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Harrison-Grimes | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Townend MBE | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DARBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.