KEN DENHAM TRUST

Charity number: 1040858
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required