Financial history BOURNE ABBEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1040896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £30.61k £59.73k £52.73k £52.71k £1.11k
Total expenditure £26.60k £61.02k £50.36k £50.43k £3.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A