Financial history ARK MEDICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1041307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.95k £24.18k £23.78k £23.78k £1.25m
Total expenditure £31.57k £22.86k £7.59k £7.59k £923.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.25m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £177.06k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.25m
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £119
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £73.60k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £917.04k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £500
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0