WHITTINGTON AND OSWESTRY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1041496
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £47.55k £50.87k £48.58k £44.90k £43.45k
Total expenditure £40.61k £55.22k £47.06k £41.68k £42.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A